VA SB15 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Private family leave insurance. Establishes family leave insurance as a class of insurance. The bill defines "family leave insurance" as an insurance policy issued to an employer related to a benefit program provided to an employee to pay for the employee's income loss due to (i) the birth of a child or adoption of a child by the employee; (ii) placement of a child with the employee for foster care; (iii) care of a family member of the employee who has a serious health condition; or (iv) circumstances arising out of the fact that the employee's family member who is a service member is on active duty or has been notified of an impending call or order to active duty. Under the bill, family leave insurance may be written as an amendment or rider to a group disability income policy, included in a group disability income policy, or written as a separate group insurance policy purchased by an employer. The bill prohibits delivery or issue for delivery of a family leave insurance policy unless a copy of the form and the rate manual showing rates, rules, and classification of risks have been filed with the State Corporation Commission. The bill prohibits an individual certificate and enrollment form from being used in connection with a group family leave insurance policy unless the form for the certificate and enrollment form have been filed with the Commission. The bill provides that "life and annuities insurance agent" means an agent licensed in the Commonwealth to sell, solicit, or negotiate, among other types of insurance, family leave insurance on behalf of insurers licensed in the Commonwealth.
Title
Private family leave insurance; definition, establishes as a class of insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 131 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB15ER) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB15S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22103667D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22103667D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Labor and Employment |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100300D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1156 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
HB1156 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
HB1156 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)