VA SB1494 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation network company; brokers. Allows brokers to arrange rides with transportation network company (TNC) partner vehicles. The bill requires such brokers to be licensed by the Department of Motor Vehicles and includes insurance requirements for TNC partner vehicles operating at the request of a broker.
Title
Transportation network company; brokers allowed to arrange rides with TNC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 635 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1494ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1494S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105036D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105036D-S1 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103832D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2001.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.19:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |