VA SB148 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community Integration Advisory Commission. Extends the sunset for the Community Integration Advisory Commission from July 1, 2010, to July 1, 2014. The bill also changes the responsibility for staff support from the Virginia Board for People with Disabilities to the Department of Rehabilitative Services.
Title
Community Integration Advisory Commission; extends sunset provision, includes DRS for staff support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 342 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB148ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101288D |