VA SB1470 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation revenues. Directs the Secretary of Transportation to evaluate the impact of increased fuel efficiency and increased use of hybrid and electric vehicles on transportation revenues, and to report to the General Assembly no later than December 10, 2019. The bill incorporates SB 1322.
Title
Motor fuels; imposes an additional tax on sale of gasoline, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1470S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Edwards ruled out of order 19106414D-S2 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105936D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 19106414D-S2 (Edwards) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB1322 (Hanger) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105936D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102496D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2217.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |