VA SB1470 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Coal tax credits. Reinstates the Virginia coal employment and production incentive tax credit. The credit, which expired on July 1, 2016, could be earned on and after January 1, 2017, but before January 1, 2022. The bill limits the aggregate amount of credits that may be allocated or claimed for the coal employment and production incentive tax credit in each fiscal year to $7.3 million. An electricity generator must file an application with the Department of Taxation each year to determine the amount of credits that it may claim or allocate, including credits earned in prior taxable years. If the total amount of credits earned in a taxable year exceeds $7.3 million, the Department of Taxation shall apportion the credits on a pro rata basis. The bill also extends the sunset date of the coalfield employment enhancement tax credit through taxable years beginning before January 1, 2022. This bill is identical to HB 2198.
Title
Coal tax; limits aggregate amount of credits that may be allocated or claimed for employment, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N 1-A) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N 1-A) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (24-Y 16-N) |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1470ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N 1-A) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House (68-Y 29-N 1-A) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Finance (15-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103387D-E |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1470E |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103387D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 433.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |