VA SB1462 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1462
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Digital Equity Pilot Program and Fund. Requires the Department of Social Services to establish a pilot program to provide a fixed reimbursement for the costs of broadband services to households currently participating in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2024. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act. Virginia Digital Equity Pilot Program and Fund. Requires the Department of Social Services to establish a pilot program to provide a fixed reimbursement for the costs of broadband services to households currently participating in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2024. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Virginia Digital Equity Pilot Program and Fund; established, report, sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200205D-H1 |
2021-02-15 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102494D-E |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1462E |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102494D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1462 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote