VA SB1456 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Tabled in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Tabled in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle fuels sales tax in certain transportation districts; price floor. Places a floor on the 2.1 percent tax imposed on motor vehicle fuels sold in Northern Virginia and Hampton Roads by ensuring that the tax is not imposed on a price that is less than the statewide average wholesale price of gasoline or diesel fuel on February 20, 2013, which is the date used as a floor on the statewide motor vehicle fuels sales tax. This bill incorporates SB 1092.
Title
Motor vehicle fuels; definitions, sales tax in certain transportation districts, price floor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Tabled in Finance by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1456S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104935D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB1092 (Petersen) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104935D-S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103949D |