VA SB1450 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Eviction Diversion Pilot Program. Establishes the Eviction Diversion Pilot Program (the Program), consisting of specialized dockets within the existing structure of the general district courts for the cities of Danville, Hampton, Petersburg, and Richmond. The Program is established as a pilot program that has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020, and that expires on July 1, 2023. The purpose of the Program is to reduce the number of evictions of low-income persons. Parties to an unlawful detainer action in participating jurisdictions will be directed to participate in the Pilot Program upon certain findings by the court. The Virginia Housing Commission (the Commission) shall request data from the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia for the evaluation of the Program's effectiveness and potential benefits and costs. The bill tasks the Commission with making recommendations for legislative action to the General Assembly, the Chairmen of the Senate Committees on Finance, General Laws and Technology, and Courts of Justice, and the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations, Finance, General Laws, and Courts of Justice prior to the 2023 Session. This bill is identical to HB 2655.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eviction Diversion Pilot Program; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 356 (effective - see bill)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1450ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1450S1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105921D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105921D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104254D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1450
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1450+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1450S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1450ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0356+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0072+SB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1450+SB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1450+SB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0253+SB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2953+SB1450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2996+SB1450

Bill Comments

feedback