VA SB1437 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1437
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Promises to appear after the issuance of a summons. Eliminates the requirement that a promise to appear be completed after the issuance of a summons for a misdemeanor offense or an administrative violation. The bill provides that an accused shall be released from custody after a summons has been issued.
Title
Summons; promises to appear after the issuance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21100562D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1437 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 74 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 936 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |