VA SB1437 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1437

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Promises to appear after the issuance of a summons. Eliminates the requirement that a promise to appear be completed after the issuance of a summons for a misdemeanor offense or an administrative violation. The bill provides that an accused shall be released from custody after a summons has been issued.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Summons; promises to appear after the issuance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2021-02-09HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 21100562D

Same As/Similar To

SB1437 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19274(n/a)See Bill Text
22311(n/a)See Bill Text
282901(n/a)See Bill Text
291210(n/a)See Bill Text
462936(n/a)See Bill Text
462940(n/a)See Bill Text
5412506(n/a)See Bill Text
541306(n/a)See Bill Text
5414407(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback