VA SB1429 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Disposition of property previously used by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute. Authorizes the Governor to lease a portion of property previously used by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute to Smyth County for a term of three years. The bill also corrects tax map references contained in Chapter 678 of the Acts of Assembly of 2019, which also involved conveyances of property in Smyth County. Disposition of property previously used by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute. Authorizes the Governor to lease a portion of property previously used by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute to Smyth County for a term of three years. The bill also corrects tax map references contained in Chapter 678 of the Acts of Assembly of 2019, which also involved conveyances of property in Smyth County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Southwestern Va. Mental Health Institute; Governor to lease a portion of property to Smyth County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-04SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1429S1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104261D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104261D-S1
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-15SenatePresented and ordered printed 21102601D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1429
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1429+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1429S1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104261D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1429F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1429FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0044+SB1429
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0123+SB1429
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0293SB1429+SB1429
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0304SB1429+SB1429
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0305SB1429+SB1429

Bill Comments

feedback