VA SB1426 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1426
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Orders of restitution; enforcement. Provides that an order of restitution shall be docketed in the name of the Commonwealth, or a locality if applicable, on behalf of a victim, unless the victim named in the order of restitution requests in writing that the order be docketed in the name of the victim. The bill provides that an order of restitution docketed in the name of the victim shall be enforced by the victim as a civil judgment. The bill also states that the clerk of such court shall record and disburse restitution payments in accordance with orders of restitution or judgments for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality. The bill provides that at any time before a judgment for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality is satisfied, the court shall, at the written request of the victim, order the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim and remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution. Similarly, the bill provides that if a judge of the district court orders the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim, the district court clerk shall remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution. Additionally, the bill states that if the victim requests that the order of restitution be docketed in the name of the victim or that a judgment for restitution previously docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality be assigned to the victim, the victim shall provide to the court an address where the defendant can mail payment for the amount due and such address shall not be confidential. Orders of restitution; enforcement. Provides that an order of restitution shall be docketed in the name of the Commonwealth, or a locality if applicable, on behalf of a victim, unless the victim named in the order of restitution requests in writing that the order be docketed in the name of the victim. The bill provides that an order of restitution docketed in the name of the victim shall be enforced by the victim as a civil judgment. The bill also states that the clerk of such court shall record and disburse restitution payments in accordance with orders of restitution or judgments for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality. The bill provides that at any time before a judgment for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality is satisfied, the court shall, at the written request of the victim, order the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim and remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution. Similarly, the bill provides that if a judge of the district court orders the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim, the district court clerk shall remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution. Additionally, the bill states that if the victim requests that the order of restitution be docketed in the name of the victim or that a judgment for restitution previously docketed in the name of the Commonwealth or a locality be assigned to the victim, the victim shall provide to the court an address where the defendant can mail payment for the amount due and such address shall not be confidential.
Title
Orders of restitution; docketed on behalf of victim, enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101671D-E |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1426E |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21101671D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1426 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 349 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 354 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |