VA SB1421 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
TANF; Back-to-School Supplies and Clothing Allowance Program. Directs the Department of Social Services to establish and administer the Back-to-School Supplies and Clothing Allowance Program (the Program). Under the Program, families receiving benefits under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) Program shall be eligible to receive an annual $100 voucher for each eligible school-age child in the home to be used for supplies and clothing essential for returning to school. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act passed in 2015 that becomes law.
Title
TANF; Back-to-School Supplies and Clothing Allowance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15103055D-E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1421E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103055D |