VA SB1413 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Oyster planting grounds; lease assignments. Authorizes the Commissioner of Marine Resources (the Commissioner) to decide which area within a riparian owner's waters shall be assigned for planting oysters and removes the $1.50 fee of such assignment. Under current law, such decision is made by the riparian owner. The bill changes various provisions related to oyster-planting grounds, including (i) increasing the application fee for an assignment of general or riparian oyster-planting grounds, (ii) authorizing the Commissioner to consider the public benefits and impacts of shellfish aquaculture or whether a transfer or renewal of an oyster-planting lease is in the public interest when determining whether to allow such transfer or renewal of an assignment, (iii) directing the Marine Resources Commission to adopt regulations related to license renewal fees, and (iv) increasing the application fee for a transfer of an oyster-planting lease. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Oyster planting grounds; lease assignments.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 164 (effective 2/27/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1413ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendments (95-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19102274D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2 | 600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 625 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |