VA SB1410 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Social Services; regulations governing assisted living facilities; staffing during overnight hours. Directs the Board of Social Services to amend regulations governing staffing of assisted living facility units with residents who have serious cognitive impairment due to a primary psychiatric diagnosis of dementia and are unable to recognize danger or protect their own safety and welfare to require that the following number of direct care staff members be awake and on duty during overnight hours: (i) when 22 or fewer residents are present, at least two direct care staff members; (ii) when 23 to 32 residents are present, at least three direct care staff members; (iii) when 33 to 40 residents are present, at least four direct care staff members; and (iv) when more than 40 residents are present, at least four direct care staff members plus at least one additional direct care staff member for every 10 residents or portion thereof in excess of 40 residents. This bill is identical to HB 2521.
Title
Assisted living facilities; staffing during overnight hours.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 97 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1410ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee amendments rejected |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1410S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104988D-S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104988D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104074D |