VA SB1408 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charter; James City County; inoperable vehicles. Authorizes James City County to prohibit any person from keeping, unless shielded or screened from view, on any property two acres in area or less that is zoned or used for residential purposes or zoned for commercial or agricultural purposes any inoperable motor vehicle, trailer, or semitrailer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

James City County; amending charter, inoperable vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 508 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1408ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101951D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1408
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1408+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1408ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0508+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0029+SB1408
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0172SB1408+SB1408
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0209SB1408+SB1408
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0701V0039+SB1408
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0079+SB1408
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2947+SB1408
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2990+SB1408

Bill Comments

feedback