VA SB140 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia ports; change in ownership. Prohibits the Commonwealth, the Virginia Port Authority, any governmental entity, and any other person from selling any harbor, seaport, marine terminal, or other port facility, or inland intermodal facility owned by the Commonwealth or the Authority. Additionally, any leases, concession agreements, or similar type of agreements that transfers to a nongovernmental entity possession or control of any such harbor, seaport, marine terminal, or other port facility, or inland intermodal facility for a period longer than 20 years at a time are prohibited. Any such leases, concession agreements, or similar type of agreements under 20 years shall be approved by the Governor. The Authority is allowed to enter into a joint venture with a nongovernmental entity relating to the management or operation of its property provided certain conditions are met.
Title
Virginia ports; Governor may enter into agreement that transfers to a nongovernmental entity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Rules | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB140S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105304D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105304D-S1 | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 10101901D | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101901D |