VA SB1392 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Achievement Career and Technical Education Committee; established. Directs the Board of Education to establish the Standards of Achievement Career and Technical Education Committee (the Committee) to make recommendations to the General Assembly and the Board of Education to facilitate the development of career and technical education Standards of Achievement, including accreditation standards, assessment testing, and course content and curriculum for participating schools, with a focus on (i) rigorous standards and course content and curriculum that align workforce skills with industry-recognized standards; (ii) robust business and industry engagement and responsiveness to labor market needs; (iii) strategies to remove the stigma from career and technical education, including early exposure to career options and life skills; (iv) work-based learning and apprenticeships; (v) innovative high school models; and (vi) leveraging existing resources and programs in the Commonwealth. The Committee shall identify any necessary changes to statutory and regulatory provisions, including existing requirements regarding (a) instructional programs; (b) instructional, administrative, and support personnel; (c) accreditation; (d) assessments; (e) graduation requirements; (f) teacher licensure; and (g) dual enrollment. The bill requires the Committee to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Board of Education by November 1, 2019.
Title
Standards of Achievement Career and Technical Education Committee; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102092D |