VA SB1392 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility ratemaking incentives; coalbed methane gas. Authorizes investor-owned electric utilities to earn an enhanced rate of return, equal to 150 basis points above the authorized rate of return, on their investments in generation facilities that are fired at least 50 percent by coalbed methane gas produced from Virginia wells.
Title
Electric generation facilities; incentives for construction of using coalbed methane gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380) | |
2011-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 380 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1392ER) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 11-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Passed House (84-Y 11-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1392S1 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104872D-S1 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104872D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104065D |