VA SB1391 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; new license for certain commercial lifestyle centers. Defines "commercial lifestyle center" and creates a new nonretail license for commercial lifestyle centers. The bill sets out the privileges of the license and imposes a $300 annual state tax and a $60 annual local tax on the license. The bill contains technical amendments. This bill is identical to HB 1987.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; new license for certain commercial lifestyle centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 13-N) (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 492 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1391ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 13-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House (81-Y 13-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1391S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104565D-S1 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Substitute bill reprinted 17104565D-S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104565D-S1 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103906D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |