VA SB1388 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Chesapeake Bay Watershed Implementation Plan; Lynnhaven River and Little Creek watersheds. Repeals directions to state agencies to exclude the Lynnhaven River and Little Creek watersheds from the James River Basin for purposes of the Chesapeake Bay Watershed Implementation Plan.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Watershed Implementation Plan; Lynnhaven River and Little Creek watersheds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 563 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1388ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100781D |