VA SB1387 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; certain students; financial assistance programs Provides that students who meet the criteria to be deemed eligible for in-state tuition regardless of their citizenship or immigration status shall be afforded the same educational benefits, including financial assistance programs administered by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, the State Board for Community Colleges, or a public institution of higher education, as any other individual who is eligible for in-state tuition. The bill has a delayed effective date of August 1, 2022, and directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, in coordination with institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth, to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. Public institutions of higher education; certain students; financial assistance programs Provides that students who meet the criteria to be deemed eligible for in-state tuition regardless of their citizenship or immigration status shall be afforded the same educational benefits, including financial assistance programs administered by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, the State Board for Community Colleges, or a public institution of higher education, as any other individual who is eligible for in-state tuition. The bill has a delayed effective date of August 1, 2022, and directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, in coordination with institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth, to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students; eligibility for in-state tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1387S1
2021-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103212D-S1
2021-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-29SenateRead second time
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
2021-01-21SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103212D-S1
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
2021-01-15SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102759D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231505.1(n/a)See Bill Text
231506(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback