VA SB1384 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; increased retirement allowance for judges. Increases by five percent the retirement allowance for judges for service earned on and after their fifty-fifth birthday. The bill provides that the increase applies only to judges who retire on or after July 1, 2019.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; increased retirement allowance for judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1384S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104958D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104958D-S1 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101297D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 1 | 169 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |