VA SB1379 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Humane Cosmetics Act; civil penalties. Prohibits a cosmetics manufacturer from: (i) conducting or contracting for cosmetic animal testing that occurs in the Commonwealth on or after January 1, 2022, (ii)manufacturing or importing for profit into the Commonwealth any cosmetic or ingredient thereof, if the cosmetics manufacturer knew or reasonably should have known that the cosmetic or any component thereof was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing that was conducted on or after January 1, 2022; or (iii) beginning July 1, 2022, selling or offering for sale within the Commonwealth any cosmetic, if the cosmetics manufacturer knows or reasonably should know that the cosmetic or any component thereof was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing that was conducted on or after January 1, 2022. Violations are subject to a civil penalty of up to $5,000 and an additional $1,000 for each day the violation continues. The bill preempts any local regulation on cosmetic animal testing. Humane Cosmetics Act; civil penalties. Prohibits a cosmetics manufacturer from: (i) conducting or contracting for cosmetic animal testing that occurs in the Commonwealth on or after January 1, 2022, (ii)manufacturing or importing for profit into the Commonwealth any cosmetic or ingredient thereof, if the cosmetics manufacturer knew or reasonably should have known that the cosmetic or any component thereof was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing that was conducted on or after January 1, 2022; or (iii) beginning July 1, 2022, selling or offering for sale within the Commonwealth any cosmetic, if the cosmetics manufacturer knows or reasonably should know that the cosmetic or any component thereof was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing that was conducted on or after January 1, 2022. Violations are subject to a civil penalty of up to $5,000 and an additional $1,000 for each day the violation continues. The bill preempts any local regulation on cosmetic animal testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Humane Cosmetics Act; civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenatePassed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2021-02-01SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
2021-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1379S1
2021-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103674D-S1
2021-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-29SenateRead second time
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103674D-S1
2021-01-26SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N)
2021-01-18SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102855D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591575(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1379
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1379+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1379S1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103674D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1379F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1379FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S01V0036+SB1379
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0161SB1379+SB1379
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0210SB1379+SB1379
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0215SB1379+SB1379
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0216SB1379+SB1379

Bill Comments

feedback