VA SB1374 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1374
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Carbon Sequestration Task Force; report. Directs the Secretary of Natural Resources, jointly with the Secretary of Agriculture and Consumer Services, to convene a task force for the purpose of studying carbon sequestration in the Commonwealth and submit a report of its findings before the first day of the 2022 Session of the General Assembly. The bill directs the task force to (i) consider possible methods of increasing carbon sequestration within the natural environment through state land and marine resources use policies; agricultural, aquacultural, and silvicultural practices; and other practices to achieve restoration of natural resources and long term conservation; (ii) recommend short-term and long-term benchmarks for increasing carbon sequestration; (iii) develop a standardized methodology to establish baseline carbon levels and account for increases in carbon sequestration over time; (iv) identify existing carbon markets and considerations relevant to potential participation by the Commonwealth; and (v) identify other potential funding mechanisms to encourage carbon sequestration practices in the Commonwealth.
Title
Carbon Sequestration Task Force; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102038D-E |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1374E |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102038D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1374 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote