VA SB1356 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Hospitals, nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, hospices, and assisted living facilities; visits by clergy; public health emergency. Requires the Board of Health to include in regulations governing hospitals, nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and hospices and the Board of Social Services to include in regulations governing assisted living facilities a requirement that, during a public health emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat, each hospital, nursing home, certified nursing facility, hospice, and assisted living facility establish a protocol to allow patients to receive visits from a rabbi, priest, minister, or clergy of any religious denomination or sect consistent with guidance from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and subject to compliance with any executive order, order of public health, Department of Health guidance, or any other applicable federal or state guidance having the effect of limiting visitation. The bill provides that such protocol may restrict the frequency and duration of visits and may require visits to be conducted virtually using interactive audio or video technology. Additionally, the protocol may require the person visiting a patient to comply with all reasonable requirements of the facility adopted to protect the health and safety of the person, patients, and staff. Hospitals, nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, hospices, and assisted living facilities; visits by clergy; public health emergency. Requires the Board of Health to include in regulations governing hospitals, nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and hospices and the Board of Social Services to include in regulations governing assisted living facilities a requirement that, during a public health emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat, each hospital, nursing home, certified nursing facility, hospice, and assisted living facility establish a protocol to allow patients to receive visits from a rabbi, priest, minister, or clergy of any religious denomination or sect consistent with guidance from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and subject to compliance with any executive order, order of public health, Department of Health guidance, or any other applicable federal or state guidance having the effect of limiting visitation. The bill provides that such protocol may restrict the frequency and duration of visits and may require visits to be conducted virtually using interactive audio or video technology. Additionally, the protocol may require the person visiting a patient to comply with all reasonable requirements of the facility adopted to protect the health and safety of the person, patients, and staff.
Title
Hospitals, nursing homes, etc.; visits by clergy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1356S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103738D-S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103738D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101880D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1356 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1732 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |