VA SB1342 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Storage and mechanics' liens; amount of lien. Provides that the amount of a mechanics' lien for the reasonable expenses of a keeper of a garage or a mechanic on a vehicle that is not subject to a chattel mortgage, security agreement, deed of trust, or other instrument shall be in an amount up to the value of the vehicle.
Title
Garage and mechanics' liens; increases amount of lien.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1342ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1342S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105623D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105623D-S1 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103458D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 644.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 644.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |