VA SB1327 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive children's health care coverage program. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to establish a program to provide state-funded comprehensive health care coverage on and after July 1, 2024, for individuals in the Commonwealth who (i) are under 19 years of age, (ii) are not covered under a group health plan or health insurance coverage, and (iii) but for their immigration status would be eligible for medical assistance services through the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services established pursuant to Title XIX or XXI of the Social Security Act. The bill also requires the Department to ensure that all program information is made available in a manner that is accessible to individuals with limited English proficiency and individuals with disabilities through the provision of language access services, including oral interpretation and written translations, free of charge, and to ensure that information obtained by the program remains confidential and is not disclosed for any purpose not related to the administration of the program. Comprehensive children's health care coverage program. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to establish a program to provide state-funded comprehensive health care coverage on and after July 1, 2024, for individuals in the Commonwealth who (i) are under 19 years of age, (ii) are not covered under a group health plan or health insurance coverage, and (iii) but for their immigration status would be eligible for medical assistance services through the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services established pursuant to Title XIX or XXI of the Social Security Act. The bill also requires the Department to ensure that all program information is made available in a manner that is accessible to individuals with limited English proficiency and individuals with disabilities through the provision of language access services, including oral interpretation and written translations, free of charge, and to ensure that information obtained by the program remains confidential and is not disclosed for any purpose not related to the administration of the program.
Title
Comprehensive children's health care coverage program; DMAS shall establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1327E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23102538D-E |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102538D |