VA SB1326 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1326
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local cigarette taxes; regional cigarette tax boards. States that it is the policy of the Commonwealth, where practical, to encourage local cigarette stamping and tax collection to be accomplished through regional cigarette tax boards, defined in the bill. The bill directs the Department of Taxation to establish a task force to develop methods for modernizing the local cigarette tax collection system and provide assistance as appropriate to localities seeking to form new regional cigarette tax boards. Local cigarette taxes; regional cigarette tax boards. States that it is the policy of the Commonwealth, where practical, to encourage local cigarette stamping and tax collection to be accomplished through regional cigarette tax boards, defined in the bill. The bill directs the Department of Taxation to establish a task force to develop methods for modernizing the local cigarette tax collection system and provide assistance as appropriate to localities seeking to form new regional cigarette tax boards.
Title
Local cigarette taxes; regional cigarette tax boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 61 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1326ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House (65-Y 35-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21104442D-ES1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendments SB1326ES1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Hanger agreed to |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1326S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 21104442D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104442D-S1 (Hanger) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101792D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1326 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Subjects
Cigarettes
Counties Cities and Towns
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Taxation
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Counties Cities and Towns
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Taxation
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3832.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |