VA SB1325 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Counseling; fees. Requires the Board of Counseling to establish, among other fees, specified fees for the licensure and certification of professional counselors, marriage and family therapists, substance abuse treatment practitioners, substance abuse counselors, substance abuse counseling assistants, and rehabilitation providers and provides that after July 1, 2015, any increase or decrease in the fees of the Board of Counseling shall be governed by the provisions of § 54.1-113 and the Administrative Process Act. This bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Professional counselors, etc.; Board of Counseling to establish specified fees for licensure, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE Emergency (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE Emergency (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1325ER) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2013-02-19 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE Emergency (97-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Passed House with amendment (97-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB1325 |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103949D |