VA SB1324 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1324
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations. Provides that no action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report, whether based on contract or tort, shall be brought unless it is filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue within five years from the date of the malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach. The bill provides exceptions for actions alleging fraud and proceedings initiated by the Real Estate Appraiser Board. The bill provides that any action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report on or before July 1, 2021, shall be filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue on or before July 1, 2022, regardless of the date of discovery of the alleged malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach. Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations. Provides that no action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report, whether based on contract or tort, shall be brought unless it is filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue within five years from the date of the malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach. The bill provides exceptions for actions alleging fraud and proceedings initiated by the Real Estate Appraiser Board. The bill provides that any action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report on or before July 1, 2021, shall be filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue on or before July 1, 2022, regardless of the date of discovery of the alleged malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach.
Title
Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101827D-E |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1324E |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101827D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1324 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2019.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |