VA SB1324 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1324

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations. Provides that no action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report, whether based on contract or tort, shall be brought unless it is filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue within five years from the date of the malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach. The bill provides exceptions for actions alleging fraud and proceedings initiated by the Real Estate Appraiser Board. The bill provides that any action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report on or before July 1, 2021, shall be filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue on or before July 1, 2022, regardless of the date of discovery of the alleged malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach. Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations. Provides that no action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report, whether based on contract or tort, shall be brought unless it is filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue within five years from the date of the malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach. The bill provides exceptions for actions alleging fraud and proceedings initiated by the Real Estate Appraiser Board. The bill provides that any action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report on or before July 1, 2021, shall be filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue on or before July 1, 2022, regardless of the date of discovery of the alleged malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101827D-E
2021-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1324E
2021-01-25SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-25SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-25SenateRead second time
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101827D

Same As/Similar To

SB1324 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412019.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412024(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback