VA SB1323 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay plan. Updates the six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources.
Title
Capital outlay plan; updates six-year plan for projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103643D-E |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1323E |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103643D |