VA SB1318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Troutdale. Specifies the terms of office of the mayor and the recorder as four years.
Title
Troutdale, Town of; amending charter, specifies terms of mayor and recorder as four years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 219 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1318ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101234D |