VA SB1314 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local boundaries for law-enforcement purposes. Provides that localities may designate mutually agreed-upon boundary lines between contiguous localities for purposes of organizing 911 dispatch and response, determining territorial jurisdiction in criminal cases, and clarifying issues related to coverage under workers' compensation and risk management laws.
Title
Local boundaries for law-enforcement; organizing for purpose of 911 dispatch and response.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | House | Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103251D |
Same As/Similar To
SB839 (Similar To) 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)