VA SB1310 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0862)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0862)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy; Coal Mine Safety Act; penalty. Updates the Coal Mine Safety Act to reflect current federal law and industry standards. The changes include expanded safety and emergency response plans; circuitry, voltage, and grounding requirements; and a penalty for any person who provides false information during investigations by the Chief of the Division of Mines of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy.
Title
Coal Mine Safety Act; updated to reflect current federal law and industry standards, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0862) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 862 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1310ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1310ER) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103428D-E | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1310E | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103428D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2471 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 161.109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.154 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.166 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.175 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.186 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.188 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.193 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.259 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.288 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.291 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.64 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.74 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.77 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.85 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |