VA SB1308 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Collection of sales and use tax. Removes the exception that persons selling certain products, such as window shades, kitchen equipment, and countertops, are deemed to be retailers and not consuming contractors for purposes of collecting sales and use tax, even if they intend to install such items for contractors. Generally, tangible personal property incorporated into real property is deemed to have been purchased for consumption by the contractor. This bill is identical to HB 1890.
Title
Sales and use tax; collection of taxes from consuming contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 449 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1308ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101521D |