VA SB1307 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1307

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Medical Assistance Services; school-based health services; telemedicine. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to amend the state plan for medical assistance services to provide for payment of medical assistance services delivered to Medicaid-eligible students when such services qualify for reimbursement by the Virginia Medicaid program and may be provided by school divisions, regardless of whether the student receiving care has an individualized education program or whether the health care service is included in a student's individualized education program. The bill specifies that such services shall include those covered under the state plan for medical assistance services or by the Early and Periodic Screening, Diagnostic, and Treatment benefit as specified in § 1905(r) of the federal Social Security Act, and shall include a provision for payment of medical assistance for health care services provided through telemedicine services. The bill also requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to provide technical assistance to the Department of Education and local school divisions to facilitate their understanding of and compliance with federal ordering, referring, and prescribing provider screening and enrollment requirements. Department of Medical Assistance Services; school-based health services; telemedicine. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to amend the state plan for medical assistance services to provide for payment of medical assistance services delivered to Medicaid-eligible students when such services qualify for reimbursement by the Virginia Medicaid program and may be provided by school divisions, regardless of whether the student receiving care has an individualized education program or whether the health care service is included in a student's individualized education program. The bill specifies that such services shall include those covered under the state plan for medical assistance services or by the Early and Periodic Screening, Diagnostic, and Treatment benefit as specified in § 1905(r) of the federal Social Security Act, and shall include a provision for payment of medical assistance for health care services provided through telemedicine services. The bill also requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to provide technical assistance to the Department of Education and local school divisions to facilitate their understanding of and compliance with federal ordering, referring, and prescribing provider screening and enrollment requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School-based health services; Bd. of MAS to amend state plan for services to provide for payment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0250)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 250 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1307ER)
2021-02-19SenateEnrolled
2021-02-16HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseRead third time
2021-02-15HouseRead second time
2021-02-11HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-04SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1307S1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103686D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103686D-S1
2021-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102675D

Same As/Similar To

SB1307 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1307
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1307+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1307S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1307ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0250+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1307F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1307FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1307FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0081+SB1307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0118+SB1307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0293SB1307+SB1307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0304SB1307+SB1307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0305SB1307+SB1307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12V0016+SB1307
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1589+SB1307

Bill Comments 750

feedback