VA SB1301 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Private collectors; delinquent taxes and other charges. Allows a local treasurer to employ private collections agents to assist with the collection of delinquent amounts due other than delinquent local taxes. Current law allows only for the collection of delinquent taxes by private collections agents.
Title
Private collectors; delinquent taxes and other charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 7-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 7-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 271 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1301ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed House (79-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance (9-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reconsidered by Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (10-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102375D |