VA SB1292 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; conduct not prohibited; consumption of lawfully acquired wine at certain licensed establishments. Provides that any restaurant licensed by the ABC Board may permit the consumption of lawfully acquired wine by bona fide customers on the premises in all areas and locations covered by the license. The bill provides that a licensee may charge a corkage fee to such customer for the wine so consumed; however, the licensee may not charge any other fee to such customer.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; consumption of lawfully acquired wine at licensed establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 559 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1292ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House (78-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 4-N 1-A) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Rehab sub: Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103480D |