VA SB1290 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1290
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ConserveVirginia program; established. Establishes in the Department of Conservation and Recreation a data-driven Geographical Information Systems model to prioritize potential conservation areas across the Commonwealth that would provide quantifiable benefits to the citizens of Virginia, known as ConserveVirginia. Aspects of the program include (i) the synthesis of multiple mapped data inputs, divided into categories, each representing a different overarching conservation value, and periodic revision of such values; (ii) access to the model by the public and all state and federal agencies; and (iii) incorporation of the model into acquisition or grant decisions when appropriate. The bill requires the Virginia Land Conservation Foundation to report on the success of the program and incorporate the program into needs assessments for expenditures from the Virginia Land Conservation Fund. ConserveVirginia program; established. Establishes in the Department of Conservation and Recreation a data-driven Geographical Information Systems model to prioritize potential conservation areas across the Commonwealth that would provide quantifiable benefits to the citizens of Virginia, known as ConserveVirginia. Aspects of the program include (i) the synthesis of multiple mapped data inputs, divided into categories, each representing a different overarching conservation value, and periodic revision of such values; (ii) access to the model by the public and all state and federal agencies; and (iii) incorporation of the model into acquisition or grant decisions when appropriate. The bill requires the Virginia Land Conservation Foundation to report on the success of the program and incorporate the program into needs assessments for expenditures from the Virginia Land Conservation Fund.
Title
ConserveVirginia program; established.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 99 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1290ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1290S1 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103330D-S1 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103330D-S1 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101901D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1290 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1018.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 104.6:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |