VA SB1290 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
ConserveVirginia program; established. Establishes in the Department of Conservation and Recreation a data-driven Geographical Information Systems model to prioritize potential conservation areas across the Commonwealth that would provide quantifiable benefits to the citizens of Virginia, known as ConserveVirginia. Aspects of the program include (i) the synthesis of multiple mapped data inputs, divided into categories, each representing a different overarching conservation value, and periodic revision of such values; (ii) access to the model by the public and all state and federal agencies; and (iii) incorporation of the model into acquisition or grant decisions when appropriate. The bill requires the Virginia Land Conservation Foundation to report on the success of the program and incorporate the program into needs assessments for expenditures from the Virginia Land Conservation Fund. ConserveVirginia program; established. Establishes in the Department of Conservation and Recreation a data-driven Geographical Information Systems model to prioritize potential conservation areas across the Commonwealth that would provide quantifiable benefits to the citizens of Virginia, known as ConserveVirginia. Aspects of the program include (i) the synthesis of multiple mapped data inputs, divided into categories, each representing a different overarching conservation value, and periodic revision of such values; (ii) access to the model by the public and all state and federal agencies; and (iii) incorporation of the model into acquisition or grant decisions when appropriate. The bill requires the Virginia Land Conservation Foundation to report on the success of the program and incorporate the program into needs assessments for expenditures from the Virginia Land Conservation Fund.
Title
ConserveVirginia program; established.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1290S1 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103330D-S1 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103330D-S1 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101901D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1290 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1018.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 104.6:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |