VA SB1290 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; tuition waiver for dependent children of faculty. Authorizes public institutions of higher education to grant full or partial tuition waivers to dependent students of faculty members employed by the institution, to be paid for out of the institution's nongeneral funds. The bill would also authorize public institutions to enter into reciprocal agreements that would allow the dependents of faculty to use waivers at other public institutions that are party to the agreement.
Title
Higher educational institutions; full or partial tuition waiver for dependent children of faculty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2013-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-02-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1290S1 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104759D-S1 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104759D-S1 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103029D |