VA SB128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; pilot program; feasibility of Department of Education; pilot program; feasibility of educational placement transition of certain students with disabilities. Requires the Department of Education and relevant local school boards to develop and implement a pilot program for up to four years in two to eight local school divisions in the Commonwealth. In developing the pilot, the Department is required to partner with the appropriate school board employees in each such local school division to (i) identify the resources, services, and supports required by each student who resides in each such local school division and who is educated in a private school setting pursuant to his Individualized Education Program; (ii) study the feasibility of transitioning each such student from his private school setting to an appropriate public school setting in the local school division and providing the identified resources, services, and supports in such public school setting; and (iii) recommend a process for redirecting federal, state, and local funds, including funds provided pursuant to the Children's Services Act, provided for the education of each such student to the local school division for the purpose of providing the identified resources, services, and supports in the appropriate public school setting. The bill requires the Department of Education to make a report to the Governor, the Senate Committees on Education and Health and Finance, and the House Committees on Education and Appropriations on the findings of each pilot program after two
Title
DOE; pilot program, placement transition of certain students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100802D |
Same As/Similar To
SB128 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)