VA SB1277 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
High school students; academic credit for certain work experience and fine arts programs; guidelines. Directs the Board of Education to develop guidelines and policies permitting any high school student in grades 11 and 12 to earn one-half standard unit of credit per semester for employment in certain fields or industries or participation in certain fine arts programs in which such student works or participates a certain minimum number of hours per week for each week of the semester, as determined by the Board. The bill requires the Board to collaborate with and seek input from the Coordinator of Fine Arts for the Department of Education and a representative from the Virginia Coalition for Fine Arts Education in developing and implementing guidelines and policies for awarding academic credit for participation in certain fine arts programs.
Title
High school students; academic credit for certain work experience and fine arts programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 145 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1277ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1277S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105761D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105761D-S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101948D |