VA SB1277 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1277

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Repeal of reporting requirement; Department of Motor Vehicles and Supreme Court of Virginia. Repeals an enactment clause that requires the Department of Motor Vehicles and the Supreme Court of Virginia to submit an annual report regarding the implementation of a program to allow the Department to collect certain fees and fines on behalf of a district or circuit court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles, Department of, and Supreme Court of Virginia; repeals reporting requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
2021-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 379 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1277ER)
2021-02-25SenateEnrolled
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23HouseRead third time
2021-02-22HouseRead second time
2021-02-18HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101135D

Same As/Similar To

SB1277 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1277
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1277+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1277ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0379+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1277F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1277FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11C0007+SB1277
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0100SB1277+SB1277
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0143SB1277+SB1277
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1902V0001+SB1277
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H19V0020+SB1277
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1854+SB1277

Bill Comments 750

feedback