VA SB1277 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Repeal of reporting requirement; Department of Motor Vehicles and Supreme Court of Virginia. Repeals an enactment clause that requires the Department of Motor Vehicles and the Supreme Court of Virginia to submit an annual report regarding the implementation of a program to allow the Department to collect certain fees and fines on behalf of a district or circuit court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles, Department of, and Supreme Court of Virginia; repeals reporting requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101135D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback