VA SB1274 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Government planning; wildlife corridors. Directs various agencies to consider and incorporate, where applicable, wildlife corridors and any recommendation of the Wildlife Corridor Action Plan. The bill directs the Department of Wildlife Resources to publish the Plan and subsequent updates on its website and to assist state agencies and political subdivisions, and by request any federal agency, in considering and incorporating, where applicable, wildlife corridors and the recommendations of the Plan when developing any governmental strategic plan, map, or action. Government planning; wildlife corridors. Directs various agencies to consider and incorporate, where applicable, wildlife corridors and any recommendation of the Wildlife Corridor Action Plan. The bill directs the Department of Wildlife Resources to publish the Plan and subsequent updates on its website and to assist state agencies and political subdivisions, and by request any federal agency, in considering and incorporating, where applicable, wildlife corridors and the recommendations of the Plan when developing any governmental strategic plan, map, or action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife corridors; various agencies to consider and incorporate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2021-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101399D-E
2021-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1274E
2021-01-22SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-22SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-22SenateRead second time
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101399D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011105(n/a)See Bill Text
101207(n/a)See Bill Text
291579(n/a)See Bill Text
332353(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback