VA SB1274 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1274

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Government planning; wildlife corridors. Directs various agencies to consider and incorporate, where applicable, wildlife corridors and any recommendation of the Wildlife Corridor Action Plan. The bill directs the Department of Wildlife Resources to publish the Plan and subsequent updates on its website and to assist state agencies and political subdivisions, and by request any federal agency, in considering and incorporating, where applicable, wildlife corridors and the recommendations of the Plan when developing any governmental strategic plan, map, or action. Government planning; wildlife corridors. Directs various agencies to consider and incorporate, where applicable, wildlife corridors and any recommendation of the Wildlife Corridor Action Plan. The bill directs the Department of Wildlife Resources to publish the Plan and subsequent updates on its website and to assist state agencies and political subdivisions, and by request any federal agency, in considering and incorporating, where applicable, wildlife corridors and the recommendations of the Plan when developing any governmental strategic plan, map, or action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife corridors; various agencies to consider and incorporate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 498 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1274ER)
2021-02-25SenateEnrolled
2021-02-23SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N)
2021-02-22HouseVOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N)
2021-02-22HousePassed House with amendments (89-Y 10-N)
2021-02-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2021-02-22HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-22HouseRead third time
2021-02-19HouseRead second time
2021-02-17HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N)
2021-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2021-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101399D-E
2021-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1274E
2021-01-22SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-22SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-22SenateRead second time
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101399D

Same As/Similar To

SB1274 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011105(n/a)See Bill Text
101207(n/a)See Bill Text
291579(n/a)See Bill Text
332353(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1274
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1274+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1274E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1274ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0498+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1274AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200058A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1274AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1274AHE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1274F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1274FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1274FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01C0020+SB1274
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0068SB1274+SB1274
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0097SB1274+SB1274
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0103V0002+SB1274
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01V0031+SB1274
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1818+SB1274
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0331SB1274+SB1274

Bill Comments 750

feedback