VA SB1272 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1272
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disposition of the unrestorably incompetent defendant; capital murder charge; inpatient custody of the Commissioner of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. Provides that a court may commit a capital murder defendant to the inpatient custody of the Commissioner of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, provided that such defendant has remained unrestorably incompetent for a period of five years. The bill provides that after such defendant has been committed to the inpatient custody of the Commissioner, he may make interfacility transfers and treatment and management decisions regarding such defendant after obtaining prior approval of or review by the committing court. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference. Disposition of the unrestorably incompetent defendant; capital murder charge; inpatient custody of the Commissioner of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. Provides that a court may commit a capital murder defendant to the inpatient custody of the Commissioner of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, provided that such defendant has remained unrestorably incompetent for a period of five years. The bill provides that after such defendant has been committed to the inpatient custody of the Commissioner, he may make interfacility transfers and treatment and management decisions regarding such defendant after obtaining prior approval of or review by the committing court. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.
Title
Unrestorably incompetent defendant; disposition, capital murder charge, inpatient custody.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 312 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1272ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101328D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1272 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote